MS SB2388 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Ratify And Confirm That Certain Agreements Executed By The Current Governing Authorities Of The City Of Hattiesburg, Mississippi, That Are Mandated By A Grant Agreement Entered Into Between The City And The Mississippi Development Authority, Are Binding Upon Successor Governing Authorities Of The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Hattiesburg; confirm that certain agreements are binding upon future governing authorities of the city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-20 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-18 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-18 | Passed | |
2012-04-17 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-11 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-05 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Local and Private |