MS SB2380 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 9-3-40, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Supreme Court To Promulgate Rules For The Courts Of This State Requiring The Disclosure Of Parties Who Or Which Are Financially Interested In The Outcome Of The Litigation For The Purposes Of Providing A Court With Additional Information Concerning Parties Whose Participation In A Case May Raise A Recusal Issue; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Supreme court; require to promulgate rules requiring the disclosure of all entities financially interested in litigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |