MS SB2380 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-15-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Insurance Card May Be Displayed By Electronic Image On A Cellular Phone Or Other Type Of Electronic Device When Providing Proof Of Auto Liability Insurance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Auto liability insurance; insurance card may be displayed on cellular phone when providing proof of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | House | Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |