MS SB2377 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalty For The Crime Of Accessory After The Fact; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Accessory after the fact; revise punishment for the offense of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Died On Calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |