MS SB2376 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate The Bridge That Spans The Coldwater River On Mississippi Highway 309 In Marshall County As The Charles Foster Memorial Bridge; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial bridge; designate a certain bridge in Marshall County as the Charles Foster Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Stone,Hudson |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2015-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |