MS SB2372 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Ways and Means
Pending: House Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create A New Section To Provide Requirements For An Application To Operate Amusement Rides In The State Of Mississippi; To Require An Inspector To Have Certain Certifications Before Inspecting Amusement Rides; To Provide Inspection Requirements For Amusement Rides; To Provide Requirements For Operators Of Amusement Rides; To Require Incident Reporting; To Provide For Incident Investigation; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amusement rides; provide requirements for an application to operate amusement rides and inspection requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Ways and Means
2020-03-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-03-05SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-28SenateDR - TSDPCS: AC To AG
2020-02-13SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Agriculture

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback