MS SB2372 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-85-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Health To Issue Up To Five New Hospice Licenses To Certain Applicants During A Certain Period Of Time; To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Moratorium On The Issuance Of New Hospice Licenses; To Clarify That The Moratorium On Hospice Licensure Shall Not Be Applicable To Any Hospice That Has Had Its License Temporarily Suspended As A Result Of An Audit By The U.s. Department Of Health And Human Services, Office Of Inspector General (hhs-oig), And The Audit Has Been Concluded Without Penalty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hospice licensure; moratorium does not apply to reinstatements following federal audit and authorize additional applicants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holland, Mims, Johnson (87th)) |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-06 | House | Amended |
2017-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |