MS SB2372 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Division Of Real Property Management Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Review And Approve State Agency Requests For Proposals To Lease Office Space Before The Requests Are Advertised; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agency leases; DFA to approve request for proposals before advertisement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To PP |
2016-03-15 | House | DR - TSDP: PP To AC |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Public Property;Accountability, Efficiency,Transparency |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PP To AC |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Public Property;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |