MS SB2364 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
Pending: House Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 7-7-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fee Which May Be Charged By The State Auditor For Performing Audits And Other Services; To Amend Section 7-7-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Auditor; increase fee which may be charged for performing audits and other services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-13SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback