MS SB2361 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Forestry Which Shall Consist Of The Programs Of The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce, The Mississippi Department Of Animal Health, The Mississippi Fair Commission And The Mississippi Forestry Commission; To Authorize The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce To Serve As Executive Director Of The New Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Forestry; To Transfer The Said Programs To The New Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Forestry And Prescribe An Organizational Structure; To Provide That The Mississippi Board Of Animal Health, The Mississippi Fair Commission And The Mississippi Forestry Commission Are Advisory Entities To The Department Of Agriculture And Forestry; To Amend Sections 69-1-1, 69-1-3, 69-1-9, 69-1-11, 69-1-13, 69-1-14, 69-15-2, 69-15-5, 69-15-7, 69-15-9, 69-15-15, 69-15-51, 69-15-53, 69-15-55, 69-15-57, 69-15-61, 69-15-63, 69-15-65, 69-15-201, 69-15-301, 69-19-1, 69-21-105, 69-23-3, 69-23-107, 69-24-3, 69-25-1, 69-25-3, 69-25-5, 69-25-7, 69-25-103, 69-5-1, 69-5-3, 69-5-5, 69-5-7, 69-5-8, 69-5-11 And 69-5-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Transfer The Functions And Responsibilities Of The Mississippi Soil And Water Commission To The Department Of Environmental Quality And To Provide That The Commission Is An Advisory Entity To The Department Of Environmental Quality; To Amend Sections 49-2-4, 49-2-7, 49-19-1, 49-19-3, 49-19-5, 49-19-7, 49-19-9, 49-19-11, 49-19-15, 49-19-21, 49-19-25, 49-19-65, 49-19-67, 49-19-71, 49-19-73, 49-19-111, 49-19-113, 49-19-115, 49-19-117, 49-19-205, 49-19-207, 49-19-211, 49-19-213, 49-19-215, 49-19-217, 49-19-219, 49-19-221, 49-19-223, 49-19-225, 49-19-227, 49-19-305, 49-19-307, 49-19-351, 51-9-107, 51-11-5, 51-11-9, 51-13-105, 51-13-107, 53-5-1, 55-3-1, 55-3-11, 55-3-19, 55-3-21, 55-3-23, 29-3-27, 29-3-45, 29-3-47, 29-3-49, 29-3-54, 29-3-85, 29-3-87, 49-7-203, 69-3-1, 69-29-1, 69-37-5, 69-45-5, 69-46-3, 69-47-1, 79-22-5, 69-27-2, 69-27-7, 69-27-9, 69-27-11, 69-27-13, 69-27-14, 69-27-31, 69-27-61, 69-27-301, 69-27-303, 69-27-305, 69-27-307, 69-27-308, 69-27-309, 69-27-311, 69-27-331, 69-27-333, 69-27-337, 69-27-341, 69-27-345, 69-27-369, 69-28-3, 69-29-103, 69-29-111, 69-29-115, 69-31-1, 69-31-3, 69-39-1, 69-39-3, 69-44-1, 69-48-1, 69-51-5, 69-53-7 And 25-9-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 73-36-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Forestry Shall Perform All Administrative, Clerical, Testing And Complaint Functions Of The State Board Of Registration For Foresters; To Amend Sections 73-63-17 And 73-63-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Mississippi Department Of Environmental Quality Shall Perform All Administrative, Clerical, Testing And Complaint Functions Of The State Board Of Registration For Professional Geologists; To Amend Section 73-39-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Forestry Shall Perform All Administrative, Clerical, Testing And Complaint Functions Of The State Board Of Registration For The Board Of Veterinary Medicine; To Amend Section 25-9-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt The Personnel Actions Of The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Forestry And The Executive Director Of The Department Of Environmental Quality From State Personnel Board Procedures For A Period Of One Year; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Department of Agriculture and DEQ; reorganize.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Bounds |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Tindell |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) |
2016-03-29 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-29 | House | Amended |
2016-03-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |