MS SB2359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-1-48, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce To Lease Naming Rights For Buildings, Improvements, Grounds Or Objects Located On Department Property For A Term Not To Exceed 20 Years In Exchange For Consideration Benefitting The Department; To Amend Section 69-5-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Fair Commission To Lease Naming Rights For Buildings, Improvements, Grounds Or Objects Located On The State Fairgrounds For A Term Not To Exceed 20 Years In Exchange For Consideration Benefitting The Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Naming rights; may be leased for a certain term by Dept. of Agriculture and Fair Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | House | DR - TSDP: PP To AG |
2017-02-22 | House | DR - TSDP: AG To PP |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Agriculture;Public Property |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: AG To PP |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture;Public Property |