MS SB2353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-19-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Governing Authority Of A Municipality To Assess The Cost And Any Penalty Against Menaced Property As A Civil Debt Against The Property Owner And/or, At The Option Of The Governing Authority, A Lien Against The Property; To Provide That Such Lien Against The Property Shall Be An Encumbrance Upon The Property And Shall Follow Title Of The Property; To Add "abandoned" Buildings To The List Of Property That Can Be Cleaned By A Municipality; To Remove The Cost Limitation For Removal Of Hazardous Substances From Property Determined By The Governing Authority To Be A "menace"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipalities; revise method of calculating maximum amount that may be assessed for cleaning dilapidated private property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Municipalities |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities |