MS SB2345 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-423, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Runoff Elections From The Provision That Requires The Officials In Charge Of The Election To Utilize At Least 75% Of All The Voting Machines Available To The County Or Municipality In Each Primary And General Election Conducted Utilizing Such Machines; To Amend Section 23-15-513, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Runoff Elections From The Provision That Requires The Number Of Ballots That The Officials In Charge Of The Election Must Print In General And Primary Elections Conducted Utilizing Optical Mark Reading Systems Shall Be Equal To Not Less Than 75% Of The Registered Voters Eligible To Vote In The Election; To Amend Section 23-15-531.6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Runoff Elections From The Provision That Requires The Officials In Charge Of The Election To Utilize At Least 75% Of All Of The Direct Recording Electronic Voting Equipment Units Available To The County Or Municipality In Each Primary And General Election Conducted Utilizing Such Units; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Elections; exclude runoffs from provisions requiring a certain number of machines must be used or a certain number of ballots printed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections |