MS SB2339 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-39-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires Certain Standards That Promote Efficient Energy Use To Be Implemented During The Design, Direction, Construction And Alteration Of Certain Buildings, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Statute And To Update Agency Nomenclature; To Create A New Section To Provide That State, County Or Municipal Building Codes May Not Prohibit Or Limit The Use Of Federally Approved Substitute Refrigerants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Provision of law establishing energy efficiency standards for building construction; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Powell,Hale,Crudup |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Carter,Younger,Parks |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-06 | House | Amended |
2023-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Energy |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Energy |