MS SB2332 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Forestry;Ways and Means
Pending: House Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-19-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Authority Of County Boards Of Supervisors To Levy The Forest Acreage Tax; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forest acreage tax; extend repeal date on authority of county boards of supervisors to levy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Forestry;Ways and Means
2020-03-13SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-12SenatePassed
2020-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-03-02SenateDR - TSDP: FO To FI
2020-02-07SenateReferred To Forestry;Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback