MS SB2325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-58.3 And Section 49-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealers On The Authority Of The Commission On Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Regulate The Hunting On Nonnative Cervids In Enclosures; To Increase The Penalty For Violations; To Amend Section 49-11-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Wildlife; extend repealer on the authority of the Comm. on Wildlife, Fisheries & Parks to regulate the hunting of nonnative cervids.
Sponsors
Sen. Giles Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks | |
2012-03-12 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-03 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |