MS SB2313 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Be Known As The "mississippi Intercollegiate Athletics Compensation Rights Act"; To Authorize Student-athletes To Earn Compensation For His Name, Image And Likeness; To Define Terms Relating Thereto; To Provide That Student-athletes Shall Not Earn Compensation In Exchange For His Athletic Ability Or Participation In Intercollegiate Athletics; To Provide That Student-athletes Shall Not Be Deemed To Be Employees Of The Educational Institution; To Provide That A Postsecondary Educational Institution Shall Not Uphold A Contract That Prevents A Student-athlete From Earning Compensation From His Name, Image Or Likeness; To Provide That Athletic Associations With Authority Over Intercollegiate Athletic Programs Shall Not Prevent A Student-athlete From Earning Compensation From His Name, Image Or Likeness; To Provide That A Student-athlete Shall Not Receive Or Enter Into A Contract For Compensation For The Use Of His Or Her Name, Image Or Likeness In A Way That Also Uses Any Registered Or Licensed Marks, Logos, Verbiage Or Designs Of A Postsecondary Institution, Unless The Institution Has Provided The Student-athlete With Written Permission; To Provide That Athletic Associations With Authority Over Intercollegiate Athletic Programs Shall Not Prevent Educational Institutions From Participating In Athletics As A Result Of The Compensation Of A Student-athlete For The Use Of The Student-athlete's Name, Image Or Likeness; To Provide That Athletic Associations With Authority Over Intercollegiate Athletic Programs Shall Not Prevent Student-athletes From Obtaining Professional Representation In Relation To Name, Image Or Likeness; To Provide That A Student-athlete's Financial Aid Shall Not Be Revoked If He Is Compensated Pursuant To This Act; To Provide That A Student-athlete Who Enters Into An Agreement Shall Disclose The Contract To The Educational Institution; To Provide That An Educational Institution, Booster, Third-party Licensee, Or Individual Or Entity Shall Not Provide Compensation To A Current Or Prospective Student-athlete As An Inducement For Him To Enroll In A Specific Institution; To Provide That A Student-athlete Shall Not Enter Into A Likeness Agreement That Relates To The Promotion Of Gambling, Marijuana, Sports Betting, Tobacco, Alcohol Or Other Products That May Be Considered Inconsistent With The Educational Institution's Values; To Codify New Section 93-19-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Persons 18 Years Of Age Shall Have The Capacity To Enter Into Binding Contracts Affecting The Use Of Their Name, Image, Or Likeness While Participating In Intercollegiate Sports; To Amend Section 73-42-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Compensation For The Use Of A Student-athlete's Name, Image Or Likeness In The Definition Of "endorsement Contract" And "agency Contract"; To Provide That No Postsecondary Educational Institution Shall Be Subject To A Claim For Damages For Unfair Trade Or Competition Or Tortious Interference; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Intercollegiate Athletics Compensation Rights Act; allow athletes to be compensated for name, image and likeness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16 Approved by Governor
2021-03-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-30SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-26SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-26HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-23HouseConferees Named Huddleston,Scoggin,Bounds
2021-03-17SenateConferees Named Parks,Boyd,Sparks
2021-03-16SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-09HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-08HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-08HouseAmended
2021-03-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Universities and Colleges
2021-02-10SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-09SenatePassed
2021-01-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-14SenateReferred To Universities and Colleges

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73423Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback