MS SB2312 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Any Admissions Charged At Certain Events, Activities Or Entertainments Held On Property Controlled By A Municipality, Or An Agency Thereof, Which Are Created And Sponsored By The Municipality Or An Agency Thereof; To Authorize Municipalities To Elect To Require The Tax To Continue To Be Imposed; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax on admissions; exempt certain events sponsored by municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Baker |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Carter |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baker, Smith, Lamar) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Finance |