MS SB2311 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 21-27-207, 41-3-15, 41-3-18, 41-3-65, 41-9-9, 41-26-23, 41-26-101, 41-58-3, 41-59-11, 41-59-17, 41-59-23, 41-59-33, 41-59-35, 41-59-65, 41-59-79, 41-67-12, 41-67-25, 41-67-37, 41-67-39, 41-71-5, 41-71-7, 41-75-7, 41-75-9, 41-77-9, 41-77-25, 41-85-7, 41-125-7, 43-11-7, 43-11-8, 43-11-9, 43-11-13, 43-16-25, 43-20-8, 43-20-11, 43-20-13, 43-20-59, 45-14-31, 45-23-23, 45-23-41, 45-23-45, 45-23-53, 73-7-71, 73-10-9, 73-10-11, 73-10-21, 73-14-17, 73-14-19, 73-14-27, 73-14-31, 73-24-29, 73-38-31, 73-55-13, 73-57-19, 73-57-21, 73-57-27, 73-57-29, 73-61-1, 73-61-3, 73-65-5, 73-65-9, 73-65-11, 75-29-805, 75-31-65 And 75-74-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorize The State Board Of Health To Assess Fees For Certain Services; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-58-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Some Minor, Nonsubstantive Changes; To Repeal Section 65, Chapter 510, Laws Of 2016 Which Provided For The Repeal Of The Reenacted Provisions; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Health; delete repealer on authority to increase certain fees before July 1, 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-28SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-25SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-24HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-24SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-23HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-23SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-23HouseConferees Named Read,Mims,Oliver
2020-06-19SenateConferees Named Bryan,Polk,Fillingane
2020-06-18SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-11HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-10HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-10HouseAmended
2020-06-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-03-13HouseReferred To Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-05SenateAmended
2020-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-26SenateDR - TSDP: PH To FI
2020-02-07SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare;Finance

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2311.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2311IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2311PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2311SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2311_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2311_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0590042.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1560003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1700018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1700030.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback