MS SB2311 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Mississippi Achieving A Better Life Experience (able) Act; To Define Certain Terms And Phrases Relating To The Mississippi Able Program; To Establish And Prescribe The Powers Of The Mississippi Able Board Of Directors Relating To The Administration Of The Mississippi Able Program; To Prescribe Certain Terms Of Able Participation Agreements Entered Into Under The Program; To Establish The Able Trust Fund; To Exempt Property In The Trust Fund From Taxation And To Establish Deductions For Payments To Able Accounts; To Prescribe The Authority Of The Board Of Directors To Invest Funds In The Trust Fund; To Require The Board To Provide Annual Accounting Statements; To Require The Board To Establish And Administer The Mississippi Able Program Or To Enter Into A Consortium With Another State Or States To Provide Mississippi Residents Access To Able Enrollment By July 1, 2018; To Specify The Requirements That Must Be Met Before Implementation Of The Program; To Require A Participation Agreement For The Program Which Contains Specified Provisions Authorizing Other Provisions That May Be Included In The Agreement; To Provide For The Amendment Of The Agreement Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide That A Contract Or Participation Agreement Entered Into By The Board Or An Obligation Of The Board Does Not Constitute An Obligation Of The State Of Mississippi; To Authorize The Board To Contract With Other States For Specified Purposes Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide For The Termination Of The Program Under Certain Circumstances And For The Disposition Of Certain Assets Upon Termination; To Prohibit The State From Limiting Or Altering The Specified Vested Rights Of Designated Beneficiaries Except Under Specified Circumstances; To Exempt Funds Paid Into The Program's Trust Fund From The Claims Of Specified Creditors; To Provide For Recovery By The Division Of Medicaid Of Certain Medical Assistance Provided To A Deceased Designated Beneficiary; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Balance Of A Deceased Designated Beneficiary's Able Account; To Require The Board To Assist And Cooperate With The Appropriate Agency For Health Care Administration And The Division Of Medicaid Program In Other States By Providing Specified Information; To Amend Section 27-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Payments To An Able Account From The Definition Of Gross Income For Income Tax Purposes; To Amend Sections 27-7-17 And 27-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Act; create to provide accounts for individuals with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20 Approved by Governor
2017-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-07HouseReturned For Enrolling
2017-03-06HousePassed
2017-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-02-21HouseReferred To Revenue and Expenditure General Bills
2017-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2017-02-07SenatePassed
2017-02-07SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-16SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback