MS SB2310 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Uniform Limited Partnership Act; To Enact Definitions And Other General Provisions; To Specify The Governing Law And Scope Of A Limited Partnership Agreement; To Provide A Default Duration For A Limited Partnership; To Create Transition Provisions; To Specify Permitted Names And Reservation Of Names; To Provide For The Formation And Certification Of Limited Partnerships And Limited Liability Limited Partnerships; To Provide For Other Filings Including Amendments Or Restatement Of The Certificate; To Assign Liability For Inaccurate Information In Filings; To Specify Limited Partners' Rights And Obligations; To Provide For General Partners Of A Limited Partnership; To Specify The Rights And Obligations Of A General Partner; To Specify The Form Of Contributions And Liability Therefor; To Create A Right Of Distribution Before Dissolution And Limitation On And Liability For Distributions; To Provide For Dissociation; To Specify The Nature Of Transferable Interests And The Rights Of Transferees And Creditors; To Provide For Dissolution And Winding Up Of A Limited Partnership; To Allow Reinstatement After Administrative Dissolution; To Provide For Actions By Partners; To Make Provision Concerning Foreign Limited Partnerships; To Provide For Merger And Allow For Merger Under Other Law; To Reenact The Text Of The Fees Formerly Set Forth At Section 79-14-1104; To Amend Sections 79-13-901, 79-13-1005, 79-13-1106, 79-13-1107 And 79-35-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform References; To Repeal Sections 79-14-101 Through 79-14-1107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Comprise The Mississippi Limited Partnership Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Uniform Limited Partnership Act; revise and expand.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |