MS SB2302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Court To Expunge Certain Nonviolent Felony Convictions; To Ban Criminal History Checks As Part Of The Preliminary Job Application Process Except As Required By Law; To Authorize An Income Tax Credit For Taxpayers Employing Persons Who Have Been Convicted Of A Felony And Who Have Been Unemployed For Six Consecutive Months Immediately Prior To Being Employed By Such Taxpayers; To Provide The Amount Of The Tax Credit; To Limit The Amount Of The Tax Credit That May Be Claimed In A Taxable Year; To Authorize Any Tax Credit Claimed But Not Used In Any Taxable Year To Be Carried Forward For Five Consecutive Years; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Ban the box;" facilitate post-incarceration employment opportunities for nonviolent felons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: CR To FI |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Finance |