MS SB2302 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Provide For A Salary Supplement For National Board Certified Teachers Employed In A Public School District Located In A Geographic Area Of The State Designated As A Critical Teacher Shortage Area By The State Board Of Education; To Increase The Number Of Board Certified School Nurses Eligible For Salary Supplement; To Amend Section 37-106-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Award And Qualifications For Applicants To The Teaching Fellows Program, Clarify Repayment Terms And Authorize The State Board Of Education And The Postsecondary Education Financial Assistance Board To Set Regulations Regarding Standards; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Salary supplement for National Board Certified teachers who teach in critical teacher shortage areas; authorize.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Died In Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-27 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |