MS SB2301 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-11-551, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Repealer On The Provision Requiring An Insurer Paying An Automobile Insurance Claim To Add The Business Repairing The Automobile Or The Lienholder As A Payee On The Check; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Auto insurance; remove repealer on statute requiring repair business or lienholder to be added as payees on claim checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-05-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |