MS SB2300 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Licensed Commercial Oyster Fishermen To Harvest Oysters From Reefs North Of Csx Bridge If Approved By The Commission On Marine Resources; To Delete Certain Exceptions For Bait Shrimp; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marine Resources; allow harvest of oysters from reefs north of the CSX bridge if approved by the Commission on Marine Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Marine Resources | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-02-15 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-01-30 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |