MS SB2282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Mississippi Ports Improvements Fund; To Provide That Monies In The Fund That Are Derived From The Proceeds Of General Obligation Bonds May Be Used To Reimburse Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Incurred By The Mississippi Development Authority In Providing Grants Using General Obligation Bonds; To Provide That The Reimbursement Of Reasonable Actual And Necessary Costs Shall Not Exceed 2%; To Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Establish A Program To Make Grants From The Fund To Assist In Paying A Portion Of The Costs Associated With The Repair, Rehabilitation, Construction, Reconstruction, Upgrading And Improvement Of Existing Port Facilities; To Provide The Application To Be Completed To Receive A Grant; To Create The Ports Improvements Fund Advisory Committee; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Ports Improvements Fund; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-14HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-13HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Smith)
2019-03-13HousePassed
2019-03-07HouseTabled Subject To Call
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2019-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-07SenatePassed
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback