MS SB2275 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1, Chapter 429, Laws Of 2021, To Authorize Jackson County To Establish A Pilot Work Release Program; To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law That Establishes A Pilot Work Release Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pilot Work Release Program; extend repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Bain,Mickens |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Chassaniol,Carter |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Corrections |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |