MS SB2272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-37-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Deadline For The Annual Audit Of The Accounts Of The Mississippi Boll Weevil Management Corporation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Boll Weevil Management Corporation; extend repealer on deadline for annual audit of accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-03 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-01 | House | Amended |
2020-05-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Agriculture |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |