MS SB2268 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Division Of Medicaid To Reimburse For Services Provided To Eligible Medicaid Beneficiaries By A Licensed Freestanding Psychiatric Hospital; To Authorize The Division To Seek Any Necessary Waivers, Make Any Required Amendments To Its State Plan, Or Revise Any Managed Care Contracts As Necessary To Provide The Services Authorized Under This Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid; authorize reimbursement for services provided by a licensed freestanding psychiatric hospital.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To ME
2019-02-27HouseDR - TSDPAA: ME To AP
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Medicaid;Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-13SenatePassed
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-30SenateDR - TSDP: ME To AP
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Medicaid;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback