MS SB2267 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 1263, 2021 Regular Session, To Provide That The Department Of Education Shall Grant Licenses Within A Period Of 21 Days From The Date Of A Completed Application To Teachers If They Possess A Valid Standard License From Another State; To Provide That For All License Types With A Current Valid Expiration Date Of June 30, 2021, The Department Of Education Shall Grant A One-year Extension To June 30, 2022; To Provide That Beginning July 1, 2022, And Thereafter, Applicants For Licensure Renewal Shall Meet All Requirements In Effect On The Date That The Complete Application Is Received; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher license; allow reciprocity if teacher possesses standard license from other state and passes background check.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16 Approved by Governor
2021-03-31HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-31SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-23HouseConferees Named Bennett,McCarty,Ladner
2021-03-16SenateConferees Named DeBar,Hill,Norwood
2021-03-12SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Education
2021-02-05SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-04SenatePassed As Amended
2021-02-04SenateAmended
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-13SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-12SenateReferred To Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3732Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/SB/SB2267.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2200-2299/SB2267IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2200-2299/SB2267CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2200-2299/SB2267PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2200-2299/SB2267SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/SB2267_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2267_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0310015.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0640068.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0820005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0830045.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback