MS SB2257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Auditor And His Employees To Examine The Tax Returns As Are Necessary For Auditing Benefits Administered Under The United States Department Of Health And Human Services And The United States Department Of Agriculture And To Make Information Related To The Audits Available To State Agencies Responsible For The Administration Of Such Benefits; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Auditor; authorize to examine tax returns necessary for auditing certain federal benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 76 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 76 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-02-28 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-02-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Lamar, Steverson) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Finance |