MS SB2257 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Code Section, Section 27-103-159, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Legislative Budget Office, The Peer Committee Staff, The Department Of Corrections, The Department Of Education, The Department Of Health, And The Department Of Transportation To Develop And Recommend To The Legislative Budget Committee An Inventory Of Programs And Activities For The Departments Set Out Herein; To Require The Legislative Budget Office To Recommend To The Legislative Budget Committee Methods For Incorporating These Catalogues Of Programs Into The Legislative Budget Recommendations And Appropriations Process For Fy2017; To Require That The Legislative Budget Committee Recommend To The Legislature By The 2019 Regular Session A Plan For Requiring All State Agencies To Comply With The Requirements Of This Act; To Amend Sections 27-103-153 And 27-103-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That The Department Of Corrections, The Department Of Education, The Department Of Health And The Department Of Transportation Comply With Certain Requirements Of The Mississippi Performance Budget And Strategic Planning Act Of 1994; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agency program budgeting; provide specific requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Vetoed | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Turner,Barton |
2014-03-31 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Barton |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Wiggins |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |