MS SB2256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-357, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Youth Court Intake Unit To Recommend That A Child Be Referred To The Youth Court Drug Court And To Allow The Youth Court The Option To Order That A Child Be Referred To The Youth Court Drug Court; To Create Section 45-33-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Sex Offenders From Accessing The Administrative Office Of Courts' Data Management System Or "mycids"; To Amend Section 45-33-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Sex Offenders From Going To Public Beaches And Public Campgrounds; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Youth court; permit referral to drug court and prohibit sex offender access to MYCIDS, beaches and campgrounds.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Russell Jolly [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Gray Tollison [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-04-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Malone, Baker, Reynolds) | |
2012-04-04 | Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2012-03-14 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-12 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-12 | Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-01 | DR - TSDP: DP To JB | |
2012-01-30 | Referred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B |