MS SB2246 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of Search Warrants Upon Oral Testimony For Investigation Of Sex Offenses Against Children Involving A Computer; To Prescribe A Procedure For The Issuance Of The Warrants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electronic search warrants; authorize issuance of in investigations of certain sex offenses against children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-31 | House | Reconsidered |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Sanford,Yates |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,McCaughn,Thompson |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |