MS SB2229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Due From Governor 03/25/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-65-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Sales Tax Exemption On The Transfer Of A Motor Vehicle From One Sibling To Another Sibling; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; exempt transfer of motor vehicle between siblings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Due From Governor 03/25/19
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2019-02-26SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-25SenatePassed
2019-02-21SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-15SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback