MS SB2229 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Section 27-19-60, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Was Repealed By Operation Of Law On July 1, 2014, To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Deny Registration And Licensing Or Revoke Or Suspend Licensing Of Commercial Motor Vehicles Operated By Certain Persons, And To Authorize The Removal Of License Plates From Commercial Motor Vehicles Of Persons Who Have Been Prohibited From Operating By A Federal Or State Agency Responsible For Motor Carrier Safety; To Amend Section 27-19-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make It Unlawful To Willfully And Knowingly Make Any False Statement Or Representation On The Registration Application For A Commercial Motor Vehicle In Order To Circumvent The Federal Prohibition From Operating In Interstate Commerce Or The Laws Of The State Of Mississippi, Or To Attempt To Register A Commercial Motor Vehicle On Behalf Of Another Person In Order To Circumvent The Federal Prohibition From Operating In Interstate Commerce Or The Laws Of The State Of Mississippi; To Reenact Section 27-19-90, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Was Repealed By Operation Of Law On July 1, 2014, To Provide Criminal Penalties For Any Person Who Willfully And Knowingly Alters, Forges Or Counterfeits Any License Plate, Decal, Permit Or Other Document Required For A Commercial Motor Vehicle; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commercial motor vehicle registration; reenact penalties for unlawful operation of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: JB To TR |
2015-03-02 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To JB |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Transportation;Judiciary B |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |