MS SB2228 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 55-15-51 Through 55-15-62, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Mississippi Veterans Monument Commission And Prescribe Its Powers And Duties; To Amend Section 55-15-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Monies In The Trust Fund To Be Used For The Purpose Of Dedicating The Monument; To Amend Section 55-15-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2015, To July 1, 2016, On The Mississippi Veterans Monument Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Veterans Monument Commission; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Died On Calendar |
2015-03-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Jennings, Calhoun) |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed |
2015-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Military Affairs |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |