MS SB2227 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Returned For Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 83-23-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Purpose Of The Mississippi Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act; To Amend Section 83-23-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Coverages Provided Under The Act To Include Coverage For Health Maintenance Organization Subscriber Contracts And Certificates, And To Clarify Certain Coverages; To Amend Section 83-23-209, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Definition Of "member Insurer" Includes A Health Maintenance Organization That Holds A Certificate Of Authority To Transact Health Maintenance Organization Business; To Amend Section 83-23-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Health Maintenance Organizations Shall Be And Remain Member Insurers As A Condition Of Their Authority To Transact Health Maintenance Organization Business In Mississippi; To Amend Section 83-23-215, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers Of The Association; To Amend Section 83-23-217, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Maximum Limitation On Class A Assessments And To Provide For The Allocation Of Class B Assessments Related To Long-term Care Insurance; To Amend Sections 83-23-221, 83-23-223 And 83-23-225, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To Previous Sections; To Amend Section 83-23-235, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Prohibition Against Using The Association's Name In Advertising And To Provide For Delivery Of A Summary Document Disclosure By Health Maintenance Organizations; To Create New Section 83-23-239, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Applicability Of The Amendments Made By This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act; revise to include HMO subscriber contracts and certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29HouseReturned For Enrolling
2020-05-28HousePassed
2020-05-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Insurance
2020-03-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-03-05SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-12SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-01-31SenateReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback