MS SB2220 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide Additional Provisions Applicable To Generation And Transmission Cooperatives Under The Electric Power Association Law; To Provide For The Amendment Of A Cooperative's Certificate Of Incorporation; To Provide For A Board Of Directors And Its Membership; To Provide For The General Powers Of The Cooperative; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Power Association Law; provide additional provisions applicable to generation and transmission cooperatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22HouseDied In Committee
2016-03-14HouseReferred To Public Utilities
2016-02-25SenateTransmitted To House
2016-02-24SenatePassed
2016-02-24SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-17SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-05SenateReferred To Energy

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback