MS SB2209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-9-120, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Review By The Personal Service Contract Review Board Any Contract For Entertainers Or Performers At The Mississippi State Fairgrounds Entered Into By The Mississippi Fair Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Personal services contracts; contracts for entertainers at MS Fairgrounds entered into by MS Fair Commission exempt from review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Died On Calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |