MS SB2201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 73-54-1, 73-54-3, 73-54-5, 73-54-7, 73-54-9, 73-54-11, 73-54-13, 73-54-17, 73-54-19, 73-54-23, 73-54-27, 73-54-29, 73-54-31, 73-54-33, 73-54-35, 73-54-37 And 73-54-39, And Sections 73-53-3, 73-53-8, 73-53-10, 73-53-11 And 73-53-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Enact The Marriage And Family Therapist Licensure Law And Which Create And Empower The Board Of Examiners For Social Workers And Marriage And Family Therapists; To Amend Section 73-54-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The "practice Of Marriage And Family Therapy"; To Amend Section 73-54-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Marriage And Family Therapist Licensure Law And Those Statutes Which Create And Empower The Board Of Examiners For Social Workers And Marriage And Family Therapists; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Regulation of marriage and family therapists; extend repealer.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-02-04 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: AP To PH |
2014-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AP |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |