MS SB2196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-26-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish The "mississippi Foster Care Fund" In The Department Of Child Protection Services And Authorize Expenditures For The Support Of Foster Family/foster Children; To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide An Additional Criminal Assessment On Drug Offenses For The Mississippi Foster Care Fund To Be Used For Those Foster Care Programs; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Foster Care Fund; provide an additional assessment on drug/alcohol violations for foster care programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2019-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-05SenateDR - TSDP: PH To AP
2019-01-15SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback