MS SB2194 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-3-721, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Section Of The Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act That Provides For The Deposit Of Fees Into The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act; extend repealer on statute providing for the deposit of fees into the State General Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | House | Conferees Named Powell,Hale,Bounds |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Carter,Hopson,Barnett |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-18 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-17 | House | Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To EN |
2020-05-28 | House | DR - TSDP: EN To AP |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Energy;Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: EN To AP |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Appropriations |