MS SB2187 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Judiciary A
Pending: House Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 41-57-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The State Registrar To Issue A Certificate Of Foreign Birth Without Judicial Proceedings If Certain Criteria Are Satisfied; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificate of Foreign Birth; allow issuance by Bureau of Vital Statistics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2020-03-09SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-06SenatePassed
2020-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-18SenateDR - TSDP: JA To PH
2020-01-29SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A;Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback