MS SB2180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 19-11-7, 19-11-19, 21-35-5, 21-35-25, 37-61-9 And 37-61-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each County, Municipality And School District To Post Its Annual Budget, And Any Revision Or Amendment Thereto, On Its Official Website; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties, municipalities and school districts; require to publish their annual budget online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Died On Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2018-03-07 | House | Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |