MS SB2165 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 35-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Qualifications And Requirements For Veterans Service Officers And To Require The Counties To Provide Necessary Office Space And Connectivity; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Service Officers; revise certain qualifications and requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Approved by Governor
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-10HouseReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-09HousePassed
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseReferred To Military Affairs
2021-02-11SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-10SenatePassed
2021-02-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-26SenateDR - TSDP: VM To AC
2021-01-08SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback