MS SB2161 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Mississippi Charter Schools Act Of 2013; To Amend Section 37-28-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Designation Of School Districts Which May Disapprove The Location Of A Charter School; To Amend Section 37-28-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Residency Requirement For Applicants To Attend A Charter School And To Require Charter Schools To Give Enrollment Preference To Underserved Children; To Amend Section 37-28-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Charter Schools To Offer Courses Meeting State Requirements For High School Graduation; To Amend Section 37-28-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Employees In Charter Schools Are Members Of The Public Employees' Retirement System And To Require Teachers At Charter Schools To Be Fully Certified Within Three Years Of Employment; To Amend Section 37-28-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Relating To The Payment Of Funds To Mississippi Charter Schools To Provide That State Fund Payments Are Based On Accurate Enrollment Projections And To Clarify The Calculation And Distribution Of The Local Ad Valorem Tax Portion Of The Charter School Per Pupil Funding; To Amend Section 37-28-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Audit Date For Charter Schools; To Amend Section 37-28-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Local School District To Lease A Conversion Charter School Facility At Or Below Fair Market Value; To Amend Section 37-47-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Charter Schools In The Authority For Participation In The State Public School Building Fund Program; To Prohibit Public School Districts From Retaliating Against An Employee Because The Employee Is Involved In Creating A Charter School; To Amend Section 25-11-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Public Charter Schools In The Definition Of Political Subdivision For Purposes Of The Public Employees' Retirement System; To Repeal Section 37-28-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Automatic Repealer On The Mississippi Charter Schools Act Of 2013; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Charter Schools Act of 2013; make technical amendments relating to funding, enrollment and operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Massengill, Moore, Roberson, Wooten) |
2016-03-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-28 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Education |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Education |