MS SB2161 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Mississippi Commission On College And Career Readiness To Develop And Recommend New Curriculum And Assessment Standards For The Public Schools Based On National And International Benchmarks; To Provide For The Membership Of The Commission And To Provide That The Commission Shall Be Located Administratively In The State Department Of Education; To Authorize The State Board Of Education To Consider The New Mississippi College And Career Readiness Standards Recommended By The Commission; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Remove The Common Core Copyright And Any References To The Common Core Standards From The Mississippi College And Career Readiness Standards; To Provide For Student Confidentiality; To Amend Section 37-16-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Direct The State Department Of Education To Discontinue Parcc Student Assessments Or Any Other Consortia Developed Test; To Amend Section 37-17-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Until January 1, 2017, The Requirement That The State Department Of Education Combine The State School Accountability System With The Federal System; To Conform References To The State Accountability Standards To The "mississippi College And Career-ready Standards"; To Amend Section 37-177-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Commission on College and Career Readiness; establish to recommend new standards to replace Common Core.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Vetoed | |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Dixon,Barker |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Hill,Polk |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Dixon, Moore, Clarke, Anderson) |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED |
2015-02-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Education |