MS SB2160 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-16-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A High School Diploma May Be Granted To Students Who Withdrew From School Before Graduation And Later Achieved The Reasonably Comparable Requirements That Existed At The Time That The Student Would Have Graduated; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students who withdrew from school before graduation; authorize high school diploma for achieving reasonably comparable requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Approved by Governor
2016-04-14HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-14SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-12SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2016-03-28HouseReturned For Concurrence
2016-03-25HousePassed As Amended
2016-03-25HouseAmended
2016-03-23HouseRead the Third Time
2016-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2016-03-14HouseReferred To Education
2016-02-25SenateTransmitted To House
2016-02-24SenatePassed
2016-02-10SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-02-05SenateReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback