MS SB2155 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Mississippi State University To Enter Into A Long-term Parking Garage License Agreement With Cooley Center Hotel, Llc; To Authorize Mississippi State University To Enter Into A Long-term Agreement To Lease The Property Known As The "cooley Building" To Cooley Center, Llc; To Authorize Mississippi State University To Enter Into An Agreement To Sublease A Portion Of The Cooley Building From Cooley Center, Llc; To Authorize Mississippi State University To Enter Into A Ground Lease With The Mayor And Board Of Aldermen Of The City Of Starkville, Mississippi; To Authorize Mississippi State University To Enter Into A Parking Garage Use And Operation Agreement With The Mayor And Board Of Aldermen Of The City Of Starkville, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi State University; may enter into long-term leases with IHL's approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed |
2014-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |